VA HB2548 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Restoration of firearms rights; report to State Police. Creates a method whereby circuit courts shall report to the Department of State Police the issuance of a restoration order that unconditionally authorizes the possession, transportation, or carrying of a firearm to a person (i) who has been convicted of a felony; (ii) adjudicated delinquent as a juvenile 14 years of age or older at the time of the offense of murder, kidnapping, robbery by the threat or presentation of firearms, or rape; or (iii) under the age of 29 who was adjudicated delinquent as a juvenile 14 years of age or older at the time of the offense of a delinquent act that would be a felony if committed by an adult. The bill provides that if a court enters an order restoring a felon's right, the order shall contain the felon's name and date of birth and the clerk of the court shall certify and forward the restoration order accompanied by a complete set of the petitioner's fingerprints to the Central Criminal Records Exchange (CCRE). The bill provides that the Department of State Police, upon receipt of the restoration order, shall enter the felon's name and description in the CCRE so that law-enforcement personnel accessing the CCRE will be aware of the order's existence. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021.
Title
Felons; restoration of firearms rights, report to State Police.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 203 (effective 1/1/21) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2548ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 19101934D-E |
2019-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2548E |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (20-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101934D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |