VA HB2553 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mass transit providers; loss of certain operating funds. Provides that any mass transit provider that incurs a loss in operating funds as a direct result of the performance-based allocation process set forth in Chapter 854 of the Acts of Assembly of 2018 may be eligible for supplemental operating funds in fiscal year 2020. The maximum amount of supplemental operating funds shall not exceed $3 million from the nongeneral fund amounts available to the Department of Rail and Public Transportation. This bill is identical to SB 1680.
Title
Mass transit providers; supplemental operating funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 551 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2553ER) |
2019-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19107121D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19107121D-S1 (98-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2553S1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19107121D-S1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19107121D-S1 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19104021D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2553E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104021D |