VA HB2557 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0214)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Drug Control Act; Schedule V; gabapentin. Classifies gabapentin as a Schedule V controlled substance. Current law lists gabapentin as a drug of concern. The bill also removes the list of drugs of concern from the Code of Virginia and provides that any wholesale drug distributor licensed and regulated by the Board of Pharmacy and registered with and regulated by the U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration shall have until July 1, 2020, or within six months of final approval of compliance from the Board of Pharmacy and the U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration, whichever is earlier, to comply with storage requirements for Schedule V controlled substances containing gabapentin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug Control Act; classifies gabapentin as a Schedule V controlled substance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0214)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 214 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2557ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106567D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2557S1
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106567D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106567D-S1
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101661D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413454(n/a)See Bill Text
5413456.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2557
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2557+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2557S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2557ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0214+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0030+HB2557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1923+HB2557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0211+HB2557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2557+HB2557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2557+HB2557
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2796+HB2557

Bill Comments

feedback