VA HB2558 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Medicaid recipients; treatment involving opioids or opioid replacements; payment. Prohibits health care providers licensed by the Board of Medicine from requesting or requiring a patient who is a recipient of medical assistance services pursuant to the state plan for medical assistance to pay out-of-pocket costs associated with the provision of service involving (i) the prescription of an opioid for the management of pain or (ii) the prescription of buprenorphine-containing products, methadone, or other opioid replacements approved for the treatment of opioid addiction by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration for medication-assisted treatment of opioid addiction. The bill requires providers who do not accept payment from the Department of Medical Assistance Services (DMAS) who provide such services to patients participating in the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance services to provide written notice to such patient that (a) the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance services covers such health care services and DMAS will pay for such health care services if such health care services meet DMAS's medical necessity criteria and (b) the provider does not participate in the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance and will not accept payment from DMAS for such health care services. Such notice and the patient's acknowledgement of such notice shall be documented in the patient's medical record. This bill is identical to SB 1167.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid recipients; treatment involving opioids or opioid replacements, payment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 223 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2558ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106525D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2558S1
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106525D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106525D-S1
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 19100464D-E
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2558E
2019-01-29HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100464D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412910.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2558
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2558+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2558E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2558S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2558ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0223+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0046+HB2558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1992+HB2558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2038+HB2558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0196+HB2558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2558+HB2558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2558+HB2558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2797+HB2558

Bill Comments

feedback