VA HB2560 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Protective services; adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation; multidisciplinary teams. Authorizes local departments of social services to foster, when practicable, the creation, maintenance, and coordination of hospital and community-based multidisciplinary teams focused on the abuse, neglect, and exploitation of adults 60 years of age or older or 18 years of age or older who are physically or mentally incapacitated. The bill provides that such teams may: (i) assist the local department of social services in identifying abused, neglected, and exploited adults; (ii) coordinate medical, social, and legal services for abused, neglected, and exploited adults and their families; (iii) develop innovative programs for detection and prevention of the abuse, neglect, and exploitation of adults; (iv) promote community awareness and action to address adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation; and (v) disseminate information to the general public regarding the problem of adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation, strategies and methods for preventing such abuse, neglect, and exploitation, and treatment options for abused, neglected, and exploited adults. The bill also allows the attorney for the Commonwealth in each jurisdiction to establish a multidisciplinary adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation response team to review cases of abuse, neglect, and exploitation of adults. Such multidisciplinary team may be established separately or in conjunction with any already existing multidisciplinary team. This bill is identical to SB 1224.
Title
Protective services; adult abuse and exploitation, multidisciplinary teams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 170 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2560ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2560H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105283D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105283D-H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102355D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1627.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |