VA HB2562 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Investigation of social history of juvenile; mental health examination for offenses indicating sexual abnormality. Requires a juvenile and domestic relations court or a circuit court that has adjudicated a juvenile delinquent of an offense that indicates sexual abnormality, upon application of the attorney for the Commonwealth, the defendant, or counsel for the defendant, to order that the juvenile be examined by at least one psychiatrist or clinical psychologist and that a report be prepared and included in the juvenile's investigation of social history report. The bill allows the court to order such evaluation on his own initiative. If the person examining the juvenile determines that an adequate evaluation of the juvenile can only be performed in an inpatient hospital setting, the court shall have the power to send the juvenile to a state mental hospital for not more than 10 days for the purpose of performing an adequate examination.
Title
Investigation of social history of juvenile; mental health examination for certain offenses.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102598D |