VA HB2567 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth; free exercise of religion on campus. Provides that, except as otherwise permitted by the First Amendment to the United States Constitution, no public institution of higher education shall prohibit the free exercise of religion by any individual, including enrolled students, faculty and other employees, and invited guests, on campus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; free exercise of religion on campus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Education
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100011D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231401.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback