VA HB2578 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Six-year plans for secondary state highways; public meeting. Limits the requirement that a governing body with a six-year plan for improving the secondary highway system advertise for and hold a public meeting regarding such plan to only those years in which the county has a proposed new funding allocation greater than $100,000. This bill is identical to SB 1684.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secondary state highways; six-year plan, public meeting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400)
2019-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 400 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2578ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103260D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
332331(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2578
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2578+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2578ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0400+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1902V0010+HB2578
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0042+HB2578
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2174+HB2578
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2248+HB2578
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0138+HB2578
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2578+HB2578
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2578+HB2578

Bill Comments

feedback