VA HB2587 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Confidentiality of tax information; local tax officers sharing information with local administrative officers. Authorizes a locality's commissioner of the revenue, treasurer, director of finance, or other similar local official who collects or administers taxes to share confidential tax information with such locality's financial officer and chief administrative officer, provided that such officer enters into a written nondisclosure agreement. Under current law, such information is prohibited from being shared between such officials unless some other exemption applies.
Title
Confidentiality of tax information; local tax officers sharing information w/ local officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103447D |