VA HB2590 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Animal testing facilities; adoption of dogs and cats. Requires that prior to euthanasia, any animal testing facility that no longer has use for a dog or cat in its possession that does not pose a health or safety risk to the public offer, for a reasonable period of time, such dog or cat for adoption to a releasing agency or through a private placement. The bill authorizes an animal testing facility to enter into an agreement with a releasing agency for the implementation of the adoption.
Title
Animal testing facilities; adoption of dogs and cats.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100315D |