VA HB2591 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; students; determination of domicile. Prohibits any student at a public institution of higher education from being deemed ineligible to establish domicile and receive in-state tuition charges solely on the basis of the immigration status of his parent.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; students, determination of domicile.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendments |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Education (15-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100538D |