VA HB2592 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Petit larceny defined; how punished.
Title
Petit larceny; defines punishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104399D |