VA HB2596 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Misbranded devices; menstrual products. Provides that certain menstrual products shall be deemed a misbranded device unless the packaging and labeling of the device indicates whether the product contains synthetic fibers, dioxin, or bisphenol A.
Title
Misbranded devices; menstrual products.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104137D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2596 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2596+hil |