VA HB2603 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Apprenticeship program; discrimination. Prohibits a sponsor of a registered apprenticeship program from discriminating against an apprentice or applicant for apprenticeship on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, sexual orientation, age, genetic information, or disability. The measure conforms Virginia's apprenticeship nondiscrimination requirements to those required for state apprenticeship agencies pursuant to federal Office of Apprenticeship regulations adopted in 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Apprenticeship program; discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 19102068D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
401120.1(n/a)See Bill Text
401121(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback