VA HB2612 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Planning time for public school teachers. Requires each school board to ensure that each elementary school, middle school, and high school teacher in its employment is provided at least one 45-minute period per school day as planning time that is unencumbered and otherwise uninterrupted, except in the case of the emergency need for classroom support or another emergency situation. Under current law, public elementary school teachers are guaranteed at least an average of 30 minutes of planning time per school day during a school week.
Title
Public school teachers; planning time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103505D |