VA HB2613 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Information for maternity care patients; perinatal anxiety. Adds information about perinatal anxiety to the types of information about which each licensed nurse midwife, licensed midwife, or hospital providing maternity care must provide to each maternity patient and, if present, the father of the infant and other relevant family members or caretakers. Currently, licensed nurse midwives, licensed midwives, and hospitals providing maternity care are required to provide information about postpartum blues and perinatal depression, shaken baby syndrome and the dangers of shaking infants, and safe sleep environments for infants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maternity care patients; adds information about perinatal anxiety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 433 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2613ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 19103752D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321134.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2613
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2613+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2613ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0433+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1201V0023+HB2613
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0056+HB2613
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2175+HB2613
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2249+HB2613
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0278+HB2613
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2613+HB2613
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2613+HB2613

Bill Comments

feedback