VA HB2620 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; governing boards; educational programs. Requires educational programs for the governing boards of public institutions of higher education to include presentations relating to student debt trends.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; governing boards, educational programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 643 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2620ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (89-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Carrico, Newman, Lewis
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Miyares, Landes, Hurst
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106562D-S1 (0-Y 98-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2620S1
2019-02-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106562D-S1
2019-02-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106562D-S1
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-29HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-23HouseReported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 19103949D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2311304(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2620
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2620+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2620S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2620ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0643+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0903V0016+HB2620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0047+HB2620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1950+HB2620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0197+HB2620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0360+HB2620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2620+HB2620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB2620+HB2620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3075+HB2620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0860HB2620+HB2620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3310+HB2620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1088HB2620+HB2620

Bill Comments

feedback