VA HB2621 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0743)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Site plan approval; decommissioning certified solar energy equipment, facilities, or devices. Requires a locality, as part of the local legislative approval process or as a condition of approval of a site plan, to require an owner, lessee, or developer of real property to enter into a written agreement to decommission solar energy equipment, facilities, or devices upon certain terms and conditions, including right of entry by the locality and financial assurance. This bill is identical to SB 1091.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rezoning and site plan approval; decommissioning solar energy equipment, etc., bonding provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0743)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 743 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2621ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-15SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-15SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2621H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106249D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106249D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 19104060D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522241.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2621
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2621+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2621H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2621ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0743+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0702V0022+HB2621
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0028+HB2621
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2401+HB2621
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0096+HB2621
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2621+HB2621
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB2621+HB2621
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3076+HB2621

Bill Comments

feedback