VA HB2628 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Military families; relocation to the Commonwealth; student registration. Permits any student whose parent has received orders to relocate to a duty station in the Commonwealth to register for courses and other academic programs and participate in the lottery process for charter schools and college partnership laboratory schools in the school division in which such student will reside at the same time and in the same manner as students who reside in the local school division. The bill requires each such student to provide to the school board proof of residency in the local school division no later than 10 days after his parent establishes such residency.
Title
Military families; relocation to the Commonwealth, student registration for courses, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104367D |