VA HB2638 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; Teacher Advisory Committee. Requires the Department of Education (the Department) to establish and appoint members to a Teacher Advisory Committee (the Committee). The bill requires each member of the Committee to be a public elementary or secondary school teacher or administrator in the Commonwealth. The bill requires the Committee to meet at least once a year in either July or August and at such times as the Department directs to make recommendations to the Department for the improvement of regulations, guidance, and implementation procedures that impact the classroom.
Title
Teacher Advisory Committee; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103506D |