VA HB2639 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health care shared savings; incentive programs. Requires health carriers to establish a comparable health care service incentive program under which savings are shared with a covered person who elects to receive a covered comparable health care service from a lower-cost provider. Incentive payments are not required for savings of $25 or less. The measure requires health carriers to comply with transparency requirements beginning with health benefit plans offered or renewed on or after July 1, 2020. Programs are required to be approved by the Commissioner of Insurance. This bill is identical to SB 1611.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care shared savings; incentive programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 666 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2639ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-14SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-14SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2639H1
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105004D-H1
2019-01-25HouseRead second time
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105004D-H1
2019-01-22HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 19103480D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823461(n/a)See Bill Text
3823465(n/a)See Bill Text
3824214(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text
5412910.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2639
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2639+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2639H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2639ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0666+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1401V0001+HB2639
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0018+HB2639
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1924+HB2639
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0142+HB2639
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2639+HB2639
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2639+HB2639
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2919+HB2639

Bill Comments

feedback