VA HB2640 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Engrossment refused by House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Engrossment refused by House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Machinery and tools tax; definition of original total capitalized cost. Provides that, for purposes of the machinery and tools tax, "original total capitalized cost," which is used to calculate assessed value, means the property's cost when acquired by the current owner plus any amount incurred to extend its useful life. If the property was not acquired in an arm's-length transaction, the prior owner's original total capitalized cost is used. Acquisitions are presumed to be arm's-length unless the current owner bought the property from an affiliate.
Title
Machinery and tools tax; definition of original total capitalized cost.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Finance (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossment refused by House |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported from Finance (14-Y 8-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103646D |