VA HB2642 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (11-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (11-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Cruelty to animals with intent to intimidate or threaten a household member; penalty. Makes any violation relating to cruelty to an animal a Class 6 felony when such violation is carried out with the intent to coerce, intimidate, or harass a family or household member.
Title
Cruelty to animals with intent to intimidate or threaten a household member; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance (11-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Incorporates HB1874 (Ransone) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19107182D-S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2642H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106255D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106255D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104510D |