VA HB2643 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tolling on Interstate 66. Limits to $15 the tolls collected on the tolled portion of Interstate 66 east of mile marker 67. The bill expands the limitation to the tolled portion of Interstate 66 east of mile marker 43 upon completion of the Transform 66 Outside the Beltway project.
Title
Interstate 66; limits to $15 the tolls collected on the tolled portion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred from Transportation by voice vote |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103674D |