VA HB2644 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Marijuana; decriminalization of simple marijuana possession; penalty. Decriminalizes simple marijuana possession and provides a civil penalty of no more than $50 for a first violation, $100 for a second violation, and $250 for a third or subsequent violation. Current law imposes a maximum fine of $500 and a maximum 30-day jail sentence for a first offense, and subsequent offenses are a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill provides that the suspended sentence/substance abuse screening provisions and driver's license suspension provisions apply only to criminal violations or to civil violations by a juvenile. The bill provides that a court may suspend a driver's license for a civil violation committed by an adult. A civil violation will be treated as a conviction for prohibitions on the purchase or transport of a handgun and disqualification for a concealed handgun permit.
Title
Marijuana; decriminalization of simple possession, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19100279D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 250.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 252 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 259.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 390.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |