VA HB2651 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Prevention of Sex Trafficking Fund; fees for offenses related to sex trafficking. Establishes the Virginia Prevention of Sex Trafficking Fund to be administered by the Department of Criminal Justice Services for the purpose of promoting awareness of and preventive training and education relating to sex trafficking. The bill requires persons convicted of misdemeanor violations of prostitution, aiding prostitution, and using vehicles to promote prostitution to pay a $100 fee and persons convicted of certain felony violations of abduction with the intent to extort money or for immoral purpose, placing or leaving wife for prostitution, or felony violations of the laws pertaining to commercial sex trafficking or prostitution offenses, with the exception of violations of crimes against nature, to pay a $500 fee. Such fees are to be paid into the Virginia Prevention of Sex Trafficking Fund. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Prevention of Sex Trafficking Fund; created, fees for offenses related to sex trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 728 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2651ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-13SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-13SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 19104379D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16169.48:6(n/a)See Bill Text
171275.13(n/a)See Bill Text
91116.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2651
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2651+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2651ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0728+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0017+HB2651
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0028+HB2651
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1883+HB2651
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0265+HB2651
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0327+HB2651
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2651+HB2651
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2808+HB2651
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0548HB2651+HB2651

Bill Comments

feedback