VA HB2652 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Regulation of licensed providers; Board of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to require disclosure of certain information about employees. Directs the Board of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to amend regulations governing licensed providers to require every licensed provider to provide a statement regarding the character, ability, and fitness for employment of a current or past employee or other individual currently or previously associated with the provider in a capacity that requires a criminal history background check to any other licensed provider with which the current or past employee has applied for employment or to fill a role that requires a criminal history background check upon receipt of a request for such information from the other licensed provider and written consent to the disclosure of such information executed by the current or past employee or other individual currently or previously associated with the provider in a capacity that requires a criminal history background check.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of licensed providers; Board of BHDS to require disclosure of certain information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2652ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-02-08SenateRereferred to Education and Health
2019-02-08SenateRereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19102852D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2652E
2019-02-04HouseAmendment by Delegate Hope agreed to
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 19102852D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2652
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2652+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2652E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2652ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0776+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1203V0018+HB2652
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0084+HB2652
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2446+HB2652
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0077+HB2652
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0294+HB2652
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2652+HB2652
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2652+HB2652

Bill Comments

feedback