VA HB2658 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Stationary blinds in the public waters; minimum distance from shore. Provides that no stake or stationary waterfowl blind that is erected in the public waters be located less than 150 yards from a riparian owner's shoreline at the mean low water mark, unless the riparian owner gives written permission to locate the stake or blind closer to shore.
Title
Stationary blinds in the public waters; minimum distance from shore.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104030D |