VA HB2662 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

High school graduation requirements; work experience; capstone project. Directs the Board of Education to develop and submit to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health no later than November 1, 2019, guidelines for local school boards to develop and implement a senior capstone project, portfolio, performance-based assessment, or structured experiment, in consultation with stakeholders representing a variety of local school divisions, industries, and education organizations, considering (i) the diversity of school divisions across the Commonwealth, (ii) the need for local flexibility, and (iii) the needs of communities and industries across the Commonwealth. The bill also directs the Board of Education, in establishing high school graduation requirements, to require students to complete a senior capstone project, portfolio, performance-based assessment, or structured experiment that relates to a work-based learning, service-learning, or community engagement activity and aligns with and further develops the knowledge and skills attained through such work-based learning, service-learning, or community engagement activity, provided, however, that such provisions shall not become effective unless reenacted by the 2020 Session of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High school graduation requirements; work experience, capstone project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 640 (effective - see bill)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2662ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference substitute printed 19107688D-H2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Stuart, Howell, Newman
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Landes, Robinson, Sullivan
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19107533D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB2662S1
2019-02-21SenateSubstitute by Senator Stuart agreed to 19107533D-S1
2019-02-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-21SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2019-02-21SenateCommittee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenateRead third time
2019-02-21SenateFloor substitute printed 19107533D-S1 (Stuart)
2019-02-20SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-01HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2662H1
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105568D-H1
2019-01-31HouseRead second time
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105568D-H1
2019-01-28HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 19104371D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221153.13:4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2662
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2662+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2662H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2662S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2662H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2662ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0640+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0005+HB2662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0068+HB2662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2117+HB2662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0258+HB2662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0394+HB2662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2662+HB2662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0963HB2662+HB2662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0964HB2662+HB2662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3258+HB2662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1001HB2662+HB2662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1089HB2662+HB2662
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3338+HB2662

Bill Comments

feedback