VA HB2663 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Watercraft sales and use tax; eliminates cap and reduces rate. Reduces the watercraft sales and use tax rate from 2.0 percent to 1.95 percent and removes the $2,000 cap on the tax.
Title
Watercraft sales and use tax; eliminates cap and reduces rate.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19100751D |