VA HB2664 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0836)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0836)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wage payment statements. Requires each employer to provide on each regular pay date a written statement, by a paystub or online accounting, that shows the name and address of the employer, the number of hours worked during the pay period, and the rate of pay. Currently an employer is required to provide, when requested, a written statement of the employee's gross wages and any deductions. The measure does not apply to agricultural employment except that an agricultural employer, upon request of its employee, shall furnish the employee a written statement of the gross wages earned by the employee during any pay period and the amount and purpose of any deductions therefrom. The measure has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020. The bill is identical to SB 1696.
Title
Wage payment statements; each employer to provide on each regular pay date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0836) | |
2019-04-03 | House | Enacted, Chapter 836 (effective 1/1/20) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2664ER2) |
2019-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2019-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-25 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2664ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19104299D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2664E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104299D |