VA HB2669 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; coverage for prosthetic devices. Requires health insurers, corporations providing health care coverage subscription contracts, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for prosthetic devices, including myoelectric, biomechanical, or microprocessor-controlled prosthetic devices that have a Medicare code. The measure repeals the existing requirement that coverage for prosthetic devices be offered and made available. The measure applies to policies, contracts, and plans delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2020, or at any time thereafter when any term of the policy, contract, or plan is changed or any premium adjustment is made.
Title
Health insurance; coverage for prosthetic devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104397D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3418.15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.15:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |