VA HB2671 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Real estate settlements; kickbacks and other payments; remedies; penalties. Relocates within Title 55 the existing provision that prohibits persons from paying or receiving a kickback, rebate, commission, thing of value, or other payment pursuant to an agreement to refer business incident to a settlement from Chapter 27.2 (Real Estate Settlements) to Chapter 27.3 (Real Estate Settlement Agents). This relocation authorizes the State Corporation Commission to impose penalties, issue injunctions, and require restitution in cases where a person who does not hold a license from the appropriate licensing authority has violated the provision. The measure also adds to Chapter 27.3 of Title 55 provisions that (i) authorize a court to assess civil penalties of not more than $2,500 per violation of the chapter and (ii) authorize the recovery of costs and reasonable expenses and attorney fees.
Title
Real estate settlements; kickbacks and other payments, remedies, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19100165D |