VA HB2675 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Initiation of a civil action; clerk of a general district court. Requires a general district court clerk to file, process, and issue for service of process any pleading initiating a civil action in the general district court within 14 days of receipt of such pleading.
Title
Initiation of a civil action; duties of clerk of general district court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104383D |