VA HB2691 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0619)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; provision of broadband services. Requires the State Corporation Commission to establish pilot programs under which Dominion Energy and Appalachian Power may submit a petition to provide or make available broadband capacity to nongovernmental Internet service providers in areas of the Commonwealth that are unserved by broadband. The costs of Dominion Power and Appalachian Power's proposals are each capped at $60 million annually. The provision of such broadband capacity is declared to be in the public interest. The measure authorizes the utilities to recover the net costs of the pilot program from customers through a rate adjustment clause. The measure authorizes such utility to own or lease broadband capacity equipment. The measure requires the Commission to conduct proceedings to determine whether an area is unserved by broadband.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; provision of broadband services to unserved areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0619)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 619 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2691ER)
2019-02-23HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-18SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (13-Y 1-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N 1-A)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N 1-A)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2691H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105782D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105782D-H1
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 19104679D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2691
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2691+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2691H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2691ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0619+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1403V0006+HB2691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0034+HB2691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0079+HB2691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2504+HB2691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0174+HB2691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0391+HB2691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2691+HB2691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0905HB2691+HB2691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0907HB2691+HB2691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0908HB2691+HB2691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3223+HB2691

Bill Comments

feedback