VA HB2693 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0217)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Qualified mental health professionals. Requires the Board of Counseling to promulgate regulations for the registration of persons receiving supervised training in order to qualify as a qualified mental health professional. The bill defines the terms "qualified mental health professional-adult," "qualified mental health professional-child," and "qualified mental health professional-trainee." This bill is identical to SB 1694.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualified mental health professionals; regulations for registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0217)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 217 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2693ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 19104241D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412400.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5413500(n/a)See Bill Text
5413505(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback