VA HB2695 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victim rights; definition of victim. Expands the definition of "victim," for purposes of the Crime Victim and Witness Rights Act (§19.2-11.01 et seq.), to include (i) a person who has suffered physical, psychological, or economic harm as a direct result of the commission of identity theft, brandishing a firearm, indecent liberties by children, indecent exposure, using profane or threatening language over the telephone, or a delinquent act that would be one of such misdemeanor offenses if committed by an adult; (ii) a spouse or child of such a person; (iii) a parent or legal guardian of such a person who is a minor; (iv) a current or former foster parent or other person who has or has had physical custody of such a person who is a minor, for six months or more or for the majority of the minor's life; or (v) a spouse, parent, sibling, or legal guardian of such a person who is physically or mentally incapacitated.
Title
Crime victim rights; expands definition of victim.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104463D |