VA HB2706 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Credit unions; director compensation. Provides that compensation of members of a credit union's board of directors and members of the credit and supervisory committees, including reimbursement for business-related travel, shall be determined by a written policy approved by the board of directors. The measure removes the existing prohibition on compensating members of a credit union's board of directors for services as a member of the board.
Title
Credit unions; board of directors compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103642D |