VA HB272 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Judicial performance evaluation program. Requires the judicial performance evaluation program, which provides a self-improvement mechanism for judges and a source of information for the reelection process, established by the Supreme Court of Virginia to submit evaluation reports on justices and judges whose terms expire during the next session of the General Assembly to the Chairmen of the House and Senate Committees for Courts of Justice by December 1 of each year. Such reports to the General Assembly are public records, but all other records created or maintained by or on behalf of the program are confidential and exempt from the mandatory disclosure provisions of FOIA.
Title
Judicial performance evaluation program; evaluation reports on justices and judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 70-N) (Y: 27 N: 72 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808) | |
2014-05-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 808 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 70-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (27-Y 70-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-06 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB272ER) |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2013-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100223D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Courts of Record
General Assembly
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Courts of Record
General Assembly
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports