VA HB2739 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Historical African American cemeteries; City of Alexandria. Adds six cemeteries in Alexandria to the list of cemeteries for which qualified organizations may receive funds from the Department of Historic Resources for the care of historical African American cemeteries and graves. The cemeteries are the Baptist Cemetery at the African American Heritage Park, which contains 28 eligible graves; the Contrabands and Freedmen Cemetery, which contains 631 eligible graves; the Douglass Cemetery, which contains 83 eligible graves; the Lebanon Union Cemetery, which contains 53 eligible graves; the Methodist Protestant Cemetery, which contains 1,134 eligible graves; and the Penny Hill Cemetery, which contains 14 eligible graves.
Title
Historical African American cemeteries; adds six in City of Alexandria.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 260 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2739ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104603D |