VA HB2741 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0554)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Clean Energy Advisory Board; low-to-moderate income solar loan and rebate pilot program and fund. Establishes the Clean Energy Advisory Board (the Board) as an advisory board in the executive branch of government for the purpose of establishing a pilot program for disbursing loans or rebates for the installation of solar energy infrastructure in low-income and moderate-income households. The bill provides that the Board shall have a total membership of 15 members, consisting of 14 nonlegislative citizen members and the Director of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy, who shall serve ex officio. The bill establishes the Low-to-Moderate Income Solar Loan and Rebate Fund to be used to fund loans or rebate payments to electric customers who complete solar installations or energy efficiency improvements. The bill provides that the pilot program is open to any Virginia resident whose household income is at or below 80 percent of the state median income or regional median income, whichever is greater. The bill establishes application requirements and procedures for the review and approval or denial of applications. The bill requires that each applicant document the installation of energy efficiency services to demonstrate that such services lower home energy consumption by at least 12 percent prior to the submission of an application. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy Advisory Board; established, solar energy installation rebates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0554)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 554 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2741ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19105980D-EH1
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB2741EH1
2019-02-04HouseAmendment by Delegate Aird agreed to
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105980D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105980D-H1
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 19104583D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222287(n/a)See Bill Text
451395(n/a)See Bill Text
451401(n/a)See Bill Text
621204(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2741
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2741+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2741H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2741EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2741ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0554+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1403V0027+HB2741
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0035+HB2741
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2411+HB2741
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0170+HB2741
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0349+HB2741
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2741+HB2741
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0723HB2741+HB2741

Bill Comments

feedback