VA HB2745 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dangerous dog; deferral of proceedings. Authorizes a court to defer proceedings in the adjudication of an animal as a dangerous dog. Such authority requires the court to place conditions upon the owner of the animal, the violation of which shall authorize the court to proceed as it otherwise would have. The bill provides that upon the fulfillment of the conditions, the court shall dismiss the proceedings against the animal and the owner.
Title
Dangerous dog; deferral of proceedings, removal of finding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 25-N) (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 25-N) (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 190 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2745ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 25-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (71-Y 25-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2745H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105875D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105875D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104730D |