VA HB2746 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0620)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Central Criminal Records Exchange; background checks through Live Scan device. Requires the Department of State Police (the Department) to accept requests for background checks through the use of a Live Scan device certified by the Federal Bureau of Investigation by any agency or organization located within the Commonwealth that (i) is a business or organization that provides care to children or the elderly or disabled and is authorized to receive criminal history record information and (ii) utilizes a fingerprint background check as a condition of licensure, certification, employment, or volunteer service. The bill states that any such agency or organization transmitting requests for background checks to the Department shall be responsible for all costs associated with capturing, formatting, encrypting, and transmitting all required information in a manner prescribed by the Department. The bill provides that the Department shall only provide the criminal history record information to the extent authorized by state or federal law, rules, and regulations and that the Department may deny any such agency or organization access to criminal history record information if the Department finds that such agency or organization has failed to comply with state or federal law, rules, or regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Central Criminal Records Exchange; background checks through Live Scan device.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0620)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 620 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2746ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2746H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105828D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105828D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 19104440D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192388.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2746
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2746+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2746H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2746ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0620+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1501V0018+HB2746
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0008+HB2746
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2090+HB2746
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0286+HB2746
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2746+HB2746
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2746+HB2746

Bill Comments

feedback