VA HB2748 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Purchase, possession, and sale of tobacco products, nicotine vapor products, and alternative nicotine products; minimum age requirements; penalties. Increases the minimum age for persons prohibited from purchasing or possessing tobacco products, nicotine vapor products, and alternative nicotine products, and the minimum age for persons such products can be sold to, from 18 years of age to 21 years of age with an exception for active duty military personnel. The bill also allows tobacco products, nicotine vapor products, and alternative nicotine products to be sold from a vending machine if there is posted notice of the minimum age requirements and the machine is located in a place that is not open to the general public and not generally accessible to persons under 21 years of age. Under current law, tobacco products may be sold from a vending machine if there is posted notice of the minimum age requirements and the machine is located in a place that is not open to the general public and not generally accessible to minors. This bill is identical to SB 1727.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco products, nicotine vapor products, etc.; purchase, possession, and sale.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 32-N 1-A) (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N 1-A) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (9-Y 7-N) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090)
2019-02-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 90 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2748ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 32-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106837D-S1 (62-Y 32-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N)
2019-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2748S1
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106837D-S1
2019-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106837D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N 1-A)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (67-Y 31-N 1-A)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19104561D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2748E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (9-Y 7-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 19104561D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182246.10(n/a)See Bill Text
182246.8(n/a)See Bill Text
182371.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2748
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2748+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2748E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2748S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2748ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0090+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0039+HB2748
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0125+HB2748
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2490+HB2748
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0279+HB2748
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0281+HB2748
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB2748+HB2748
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0546HB2748+HB2748
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2810+HB2748

Bill Comments

feedback