VA HB2752 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Motorized skateboards or scooters; operation; local authority. Authorizes localities to regulate the operation of companies providing motorized skateboards or scooters for hire. The bill changes the definition of motorized skateboard or scooter by (i) removing the requirement that such device have no seat and requiring that the device be designed to allow a person to stand or sit, (ii) removing the maximum power limits for such device and providing that the device may be powered in whole or in part by an electric motor, (iii) providing that the device has a speed of no more than 20 miles per hour, and (iv) providing that such device weighs less than 100 pounds. The bill makes consistent the operational requirements for motorized skateboards or scooters and similar devices, including (a) allowing motorized skateboards and scooters to be driven on sidewalks, (b) requiring motorized skateboards and scooters driven on a roadway to be driven as close to the right curb as is safely practicable, (c) prohibiting the operation of motorized skateboards or scooters on any Interstate Highway System component, and (d) requiring operators of motorized skateboards and scooters to give hand signals and have lights on such devices. The bill prohibits operating a motorized skateboard or scooter at a speed faster than 20 miles per hour. Certain provisions of this bill have a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorized skateboards or scooters; clarifies definitions, riding or driving on sidewalks, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 780 (effective - see bill)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2752ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2752H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105949D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105949D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 3-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 19105160D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462100(n/a)See Bill Text
4621015(n/a)See Bill Text
4621041(n/a)See Bill Text
4621081(n/a)See Bill Text
4621315(n/a)See Bill Text
462800(n/a)See Bill Text
462849(n/a)See Bill Text
462903(n/a)See Bill Text
462904(n/a)See Bill Text
462905(n/a)See Bill Text
462908.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2752
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2752+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2752H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2752ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0780+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1901V0011+HB2752
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0039+HB2752
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2186+HB2752
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2260+HB2752
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0151+HB2752
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2752+HB2752
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2752+HB2752

Bill Comments

feedback