VA HB2760 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Redistricting; Geographic Information System maps required; review by the Department of Elections. Requires the clerk of the county, city, or town to send a Geographic Information System (GIS) map, along with the ordinance containing a description of the boundaries, to the local electoral board, the Secretary of the Commonwealth, the Department of Elections, and the Division of Legislative Services when redistricting local election districts or making any changes to the local election districts or precincts. If a county, city, or town does not have GIS capabilities, the locality may request the Department of Elections to create a GIS map on its behalf and the Department of Elections shall create such a map. The bill requires the Department to review any ordinance and GIS map received and compare the boundaries contained within with the information in the voter registration system to ensure voters have been assigned to the correct districts and to notify localities of any corrections that may be necessary. The Department is further required to maintain and make available on its official website maps showing the current election district and precinct boundaries of each county and city. This bill is identical to SB 1018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redistricting; GIS maps required, review by the Department of Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 777 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2760ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateAmendment by Senator Peake ruled out of order
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19107305D-S1
2019-02-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 19107305D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-12SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19104650D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2760E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-01HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 19104650D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242103.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242304.3(n/a)See Bill Text
242306(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2760
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2760+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2760E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2760S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2760ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0777+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1802V0018+HB2760
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0020+HB2760
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0204V0011+HB2760
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0067+HB2760
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2414+HB2760
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0126+HB2760
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0397+HB2760
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2760+HB2760
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0896HB2760+HB2760

Bill Comments

feedback