VA HB2786 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-4)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Coal combustion residuals impoundment; closure. Requires the owner or operator of any coal combustion residuals (CCR) unit, defined in the bill to include a coal ash pond or landfill, within the Chesapeake Bay watershed at Bremo Power Station, Chesapeake Energy Center, Chesterfield Power Station, and Possum Point Power Station to close such CCR unit by removing all of the CCR for (i) recycling, known as encapsulated beneficial use, or (ii) deposition in a permitted and lined landfill that meets certain federal standards. The measure requires that any owner or operator beneficially reuse no less than 6.8 million cubic yards in aggregate of such removed CCR from no fewer than two of the sites. Such a closure project shall be completed within 15 years of its initiation and shall be accompanied by an offer by the owner or operator to provide connection to a municipal water supply for every residence within one-half mile, or if such connection is not feasible, the owner or operator shall offer to provide water testing for any such residence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coal combustion residuals impoundment; closure of certain CCR units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 650 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 25, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2786ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106661D-S1 (96-Y 2-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2786S1
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106661D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106661D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2786H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105744D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105744D-H1
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19105272D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2786
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2786+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2786H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2786S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2786ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0650+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0020+HB2786
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2431+HB2786
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0144+HB2786
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2786+HB2786
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0652HB2786+HB2786
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2925+HB2786

Bill Comments

feedback