VA HB279 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sentencing proceeding by the jury after conviction; recommendation of leniency. Provides that a jury may, in ascertaining the punishment for a person convicted of a felony or Class 1 misdemeanor, recommend that the sentence imposed be suspended in whole or in part, or that sentences imposed for multiple offenses be served concurrently, except where such suspension of sentence or concurrent service is prohibited by law. The bill prohibits the trial court from imposing an active term of incarceration in excess of the active term of incarceration recommended by the jury. The bill also allows the jury to recommend that the defendant be placed on probation, make full or partial restitution, perform community service, or receive mental health or substance abuse treatment in lieu of incarceration or as a condition of any suspended sentence, and requires the court to follow such recommendation unless good cause is shown for why the recommendation is inappropriate or unavailable.
Title
Sentencing proceeding by the jury after conviction; recommendation of leniency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101181D |