VA HB2790 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee voting; no-excuse in-person voting available beginning on second Saturday immediately preceding election. Allows for any registered voter to vote by absentee ballot in person beginning on the second Saturday immediately preceding any election in which he is qualified to vote without providing a reason or making prior application for an absentee ballot. The bill makes absentee voting in person available beginning on the forty-fifth day prior to the election and ending at 5:00 p.m. on the Saturday immediately preceding the election. The bill retains the current provisions for voting with an absentee ballot by mail or in person prior to the second Saturday immediately preceding the election, including the application requirement and the list of statutory reasons for absentee voting. The provisions of the bill do not become effective until the November 3, 2020, general election, and the State Board of Elections is required to submit a report on the procedures and instructions it promulgates for conducting absentee voting pursuant to the provisions of the bill. This bill is identical to SB 1026.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; no-excuse in-person, beginning on 2nd Sat. immediately preceding election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 668 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2790ER)
2019-02-23HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (90-Y 9-N)
2019-02-21SenatePassed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N)
2019-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-21SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-21SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-21SenateRead third time
2019-02-20SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance (12-Y 4-N)
2019-02-12SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-12SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 2-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19102828D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2790E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19102828D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2421004(n/a)See Bill Text
242452(n/a)See Bill Text
242612(n/a)See Bill Text
242700(n/a)See Bill Text
242701(n/a)See Bill Text
242701.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242702.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242703.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242703.2(n/a)See Bill Text
242706(n/a)See Bill Text
242707(n/a)See Bill Text
242709(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2790
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2790+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2790E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2790ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0668+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1801V0013+HB2790
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0018+HB2790
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2494+HB2790
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0128+HB2790
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0372+HB2790
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2790+HB2790
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0966HB2790+HB2790
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3259+HB2790

Bill Comments

feedback