VA HB2806 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; codification of ordinances; affirmative defense. Requires each locality to codify all ordinances, in permanently bound or loose-leaf form or in an online format so as to be easily accessed by other governmental entities and the public. The bill provides that any person who is the subject of an action brought by a locality for violation of an ordinance is entitled to assert as an affirmative defense that the ordinance was not codified and therefore failed to provide adequate notice to the public of the contents of the ordinance.
Title
Local government; codification of ordinances, affirmative defense.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19102462D |